Global Patent Index - EP 0903836 A3

EP 0903836 A3 2000-05-17 - Thermal protection switch

Title (en)

Thermal protection switch

Title (de)

Thermoschutzschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de protection thermique

Publication

EP 0903836 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117405 A

Priority

CH 222197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903836A2] The switch has a thermostat (1,2) with a snap-action bimetallic disc, coupled by a transmission pin (3) with a controlled bridge contact (4), cooperating with 2 spaced terminals (6,6'). The resetting button (9) for the transmission pin is hollow with an internal light source (12) illuminated upon release of the contact bridge, for indicating the condition of the thermal protection switch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 11/00; H01H 9/16; H01H 37/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/161 (2013.01); H01H 37/5409 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903836 A2 19990324; EP 0903836 A3 20000517; CN 1212449 A 19990331

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001118

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 02K 11/00 A, 7H 01H 37/54 B, 7H 01H 9/16 B

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI