Global Patent Index - EP 0904021 A4

EP 0904021 A4 2000-05-17 - ROTARY DEVICE FOR REMOVING OPHTHALMIC LENS

Title (en)

ROTARY DEVICE FOR REMOVING OPHTHALMIC LENS

Title (de)

ROTATIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN EINER AUGENLINSE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ROTATIF POUR LE RETRAIT DU CRISTALLIN

Publication

EP 0904021 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96920470 A

Priority

  • BR 9612633 A
  • CA 2255902 A
  • CN 96180395 A
  • NO 985448 A
  • US 9607635 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745061A1] This invention is a system (300) and method for reducing and removing ophthalmic lens of a mammalian eye. The system (300) includes a rotary lens reducing probe device (302) of either straight or curved configuration, said probe device (302) comprising a tubular outer sheath (320) through which a rotatable drive shaft (316) extends. A rotating lens reducing head member (318) is positioned on the distal end of the drive shaft (316). The head member (318) is configured and constructed to draw a flow of fluid and lens matter into contact therewith, thereby facilitating complete reduction of the entire lens without requiring significant axial (i.e., longitudinal) movement of the probe within the lens capsule. The distal portion of the tubular sheath (320) is preferably configured to shield a portion of the lens reducing head (318) during operation to avoid inadvertent damage to lens capsule. Also, the distal portion of the sheath (320) may be aimed or positioned to direct the flow of fluid and lens matter created by the rotating head in a preferred flow path within the lens capsule. The device (302) may incorporate means for infusing and/or withdrawing fluid, and/or debris into/from the eye.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/00763 (2013.01); A61B 2017/320775 (2013.01); A61B 2090/08021 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745061 A1 19971204; AU 5875896 A 19980105; AU 738088 B2 20010906; BR 9612633 A 19991228; CA 2255902 A1 19971204; CN 1226145 A 19990818; CZ 9803731 A3 19990512; EP 0904021 A1 19990331; EP 0904021 A4 20000517; SI 9620140 A 19990630

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041016

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030515

2000-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPTEX OPHTHALMOLOGICS, INC.

2000-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SORENSEN, JOHN T.

2000-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MITTELSTEIN, MICHAEL

2000-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIRHASHEMI, SOHEILA

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981123

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE