Global Patent Index - EP 0904202 B1

EP 0904202 B1 2001-03-14 - EQUIPMENT FOR REMOTE SIGNING AND WRITING

Title (en)

EQUIPMENT FOR REMOTE SIGNING AND WRITING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM FERNUNTERSCHREIBEN UND -SCHREIBEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR SIGNATURE ET ECRITURE A DISTANCE

Publication

EP 0904202 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97926039 A

Priority

  • FR 9700920 W
  • FR 9606892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745271A1] The equipment (1) enables remote document reading, filling and writing, being commanded from a remote terminal (10) provided with a screen (11) and a keyboard (12). This equipment (1) comprises a document internal circuit (4) supplied from a tray (3), on which are set an optical read head (7) and a print head (8) associated to operate on the same document being processed. The read head (7) enables the progressive transmission of the document image on the terminal screen (11). This terminal keyboard (12) provides remote control for moving the document forward and backward in the equipment (1), writing a text and/or signing the document via the print head (8), and ejecting the processed document into a supply tray (5), the signature possibly being accompanied by a control code. The invention is useful in remote signing in commercial and banking activities, remote filling of administrative forms, teleworking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 3/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745271 A1 19971204; DE 69704273 D1 20010419; DE 69704273 T2 20011011; EP 0904202 A1 19990331; EP 0904202 B1 20010314; FR 2749417 A1 19971205; FR 2749417 B1 19980821

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030602

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020412

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GIROD RAOUL

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-07-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-06-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010625

2001-06-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010625

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010526

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704273 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU

2001-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIROD, RAOUL

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIROD, RAOUL

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991104

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981211

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU