Global Patent Index - EP 0904237 B1

EP 0904237 B1 2000-03-01 - CONTAINER CAP AND CONTAINER MOUTH

Title (en)

CONTAINER CAP AND CONTAINER MOUTH

Title (de)

BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS UND BEHÄLTERMÜNDUNG

Title (fr)

BOUCHON DE RECIPIENT ET EMBOUCHURE DE RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 0904237 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916298 A

Priority

  • CH 9700159 W
  • CH 118796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743188A1] The invention concerns a snap-on cap or a screw cap which has a multiple thread and comprises auxiliary retention means (10) which can hold the cap in the axial direction on both sides of a container mouth (8) which is to be closed, before the cap retention elements (6) engage with the retention elements (7) on the container mouth (8) and close the latter sealingly in a leaktight position. The force (F1) required to press on the auxiliary retention means (10) is less than the closure force (F2). The auxiliary retention means (10) prevent the cap from popping off or tilting in a filling plant. Instead of the cap (1), the container mouth (8) can also be provided with auxiliary retention means (30), a conventional cap then being used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/18; B65D 41/02; B67B 3/02; B67B 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/02 (2006.01); B65D 41/18 (2006.01); B67B 3/02 (2006.01); B67B 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 3/02 (2013.01); B65D 41/02 (2013.01); B65D 41/185 (2013.01); B67B 3/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743188 A1 19971120; AR 006885 A1 19990929; AT 190029 T 20000315; AU 2501997 A 19971205; CA 2250886 A1 19971120; DE 59701183 D1 20000406; EP 0904237 A1 19990331; EP 0904237 B1 20000301; ID 18171 A 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010520

2001-05-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010520

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CROWN CORK A.G.

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000421

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701183 20000406

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190029 T 20000315

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990427

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980928

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE