Global Patent Index - EP 0904397 A4

EP 0904397 A4 20030129 - A METHOD FOR DETECTION OF PROSTATE SPECIFIC ANTIGEN USED IN MONITORING AND DIAGNOSIS OF PROSTATE CANCER

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR DETECTION OF PROSTATE SPECIFIC ANTIGEN USED IN MONITORING AND DIAGNOSIS OF PROSTATE CANCER

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR ERKENNUNG DES PROSTAT-SPEZIFISCHEN ANTIGENS ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND DIAGNOSE VON PROSTATKREBS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE L'ANTIGENE SPECIFIQUE DE LA PROSTATE UTILISE POUR SURVEILLER ET DIAGNOSTIQUER LE CANCER DE LA PROSTATE

Publication

EP 0904397 A4 20030129 (EN)

Application

EP 97918724 A 19970416

Priority

  • US 9706497 W 19970416
  • US 1576596 P 19960416

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9739139A1] Primers specific for prostate specific antigen and a method for monitoring and diagnosing prostate cancer using these primers is provided. Kits for diagnosing prostate cancer containing these primers are also provided.

IPC 1-7

C12P 19/34; C07H 21/04; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2018.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C12N 9/6445 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0520794 A1 19921230 - HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al
  • [Y] DEGUCHI T ET AL: "DETECTION OF MICROMETASTATIC PROSTATE CANCER CELLS IN LYMPH NODES BY TRANSCRIPTASE-POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 53, 15 November 1993 (1993-11-15), pages 5350 - 5354, XP002059297, ISSN: 0008-5472
  • [Y] RIEGMAN P H J ET AL: "Characterization of the prostate-specific gene: A novel human Kallikrein-like gene", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 159, no. 1, 28 February 1989 (1989-02-28), pages 95 - 102, XP002141957, ISSN: 0006-291X
  • [A] DIGBY M ET AL: "HUMAN PROSTATE SPECIFIC ANTIGEN (PSA) GENE: STRUCTURE AND LINKAGE TO THE KALLIKREIN-LIKE GENE, HGK-1", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 17, no. 5, 1989, pages 2137, XP000999289, ISSN: 0305-1048
  • [A] STRAY J ET AL: "REVERSE TRANSCRIPTION POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION (RT-PCR) DETECTS METASTATIC PROSTATE CANCER CELLS IN LYMPH NODES, BLOOD AND POTENTIALLY IN BONE MARROW USING PSA-MRNA AS TEMPLATE", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 151, no. SUPPL 5, 1994, pages 412A, XP002910106, ISSN: 0022-5347
  • [A] TAKAYAMA T K ET AL: "NEWER APPLICATIONS OF SERUM PROSTATE-SPECIFIC ANTIGEN IN THE MANAGEMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, US, vol. 21, no. 5, 1 October 1994 (1994-10-01), pages 542 - 553, XP002059296
  • [A] STONE N ET AL: "DETECTION OF CIRCULATING METASTATIC TUMOR CELLS BY PSA AND PSM MAY BE USEFUL TO IDENTIFY SUBGROUPS OF ADVANCED PROSTATE CANCER PATIENTS", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 37, 1 March 1996 (1996-03-01), pages 247, XP002910105, ISSN: 0008-5472
  • [A] PANTEL K AND RIETHMÜLLER G: "Methods for detection of micrometastatic carcinoma cells in bone marrow, blood, and lymph nodes", ONKOLOGIE, KARGER, FREIBURG, DE, vol. 18, 1995, pages 394 - 401, XP002092612, ISSN: 0378-584X
  • [A] PELKEY J P ET AL: "Molecular and immunological detection of circulating tumor cells and micrometastases from solid tumors", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, US, vol. 42, no. 9, 1996, pages 1369 - 1381, XP002092613, ISSN: 0009-9147
  • See also references of WO 9739139A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 9739139 A1 19971023; AU 2676197 A 19971107; EP 0904397 A1 19990331; EP 0904397 A4 20030129; JP 2000510331 A 20000815; ZA 973231 B 19971125

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 9706497 W 19970416; AU 2676197 A 19970416; EP 97918724 A 19970416; JP 53739597 A 19970416; ZA 973231 A 19970416