Global Patent Index - EP 0904438 B1

EP 0904438 B1 2001-12-19 - PROCESS FOR JOINING SEVERAL KNITTED FABRICS ON A FLATBED KNITTING MACHINE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR JOINING SEVERAL KNITTED FABRICS ON A FLATBED KNITTING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN MEHRERER GESTRICKTEILE AUF EINER FLACHSTRICKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RELIER PLUSIEURS PIECES TRICOTEES SUR UNE TRICOTEUSE RECTILIGNE

Publication

EP 0904438 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97922854 A

Priority

  • DE 9700788 W
  • DE 19616004 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19616004A1] A process is disclosed for joining several knitted fabrics on a flatbed knitting machine. Several knitted fabrics (10, 14, 20) are produced successively or in different areas of the flatbed knitting machine, then joined by knitting-on or another usual technique for joining stitches on different needle beds. When two knitted fabrics are produced on a single needle bed, it is necessary to hang one knitted fabric onto an auxiliary or supplementary needle bed and to offset the latter sideways, so that the desired joining areas may be knitted together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01); D04B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D04B 1/108 (2013.01); D10B 2403/032 (2013.01); D10B 2505/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19616004 A1 19971023; DE 59712805 D1 20070315; EP 0904438 A1 19990331; EP 0904438 B1 20011219; EP 1070777 A2 20010124; EP 1070777 A3 20010314; EP 1070777 B1 20050126; EP 1072708 A2 20010131; EP 1072708 A3 20010228; EP 1074651 A2 20010207; EP 1074651 A3 20020327; EP 1074651 B1 20070124; JP 2001501258 A 20010130; US 6205822 B1 20010327; US 6257024 B1 20010710; WO 9740219 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170417

2017-05-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170417

2017-04-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705896

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-03-01 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040326

2002-11-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: H. STOLL GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705896 20020131

2002-01-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER ACHTER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECARO GMBH & CO.

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981030

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT