Global Patent Index - EP 0904458 B1

EP 0904458 B1 2001-12-19 - POINT-OPERATING SYSTEM

Title (en)

POINT-OPERATING SYSTEM

Title (de)

WEICHENSTELLSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MANOEUVRE D'AIGUILLE

Publication

EP 0904458 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925069 A

Priority

  • DE 19623286 A
  • EP 9703001 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19623286A1] The invention concerns a point-operating system (1) with moving tongues (3) and moving switch diamonds located in box-type sleepers (6). The reliability of the system is improved, in particular the availability of the tongue is increased, by virtue of the fact that exposed areas have a flexible covering (9, 10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/20 (2013.01); B61L 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19623286 A1 19971218; AT 211202 T 20020115; AU 3033497 A 19980107; EP 0904458 A1 19990331; EP 0904458 B1 20011219; WO 9747812 A1 19971218

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-11 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20041216

2002-11-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG CT IP TS

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705897 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211202 T 20020115

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981209

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI