Global Patent Index - EP 0904463 B1

EP 0904463 B1 2003-06-11 - DEVICE FOR POSITIONING OF MOULDED STRUCTURES OF A RAILWAY LEVEL CROSSING ON RAILWAY LINES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR POSITIONING OF MOULDED STRUCTURES OF A RAILWAY LEVEL CROSSING ON RAILWAY LINES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR LAGEFIXIERUNG VON FORMKÖRPERN EINER GLEISÜBERGANGSEINRICHTUNG AN EINER GLEISANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR FIXER LA POSITION DE CORPS MOULES D'UN PASSAGE A NIVEAU SUR DES VOIES FERREES

Publication

EP 0904463 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925989 A

Priority

  • DE 19623135 A
  • EP 9702999 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19623135A1] The invention relates to a device for positioning of moulded structures of a railway level crossing on railway lines. Said device comprises at least one positioning rod means (22a) extending in the longitudinal direction of the railway lines along the moulded structure (16a), and end support means (28a) which can be rigidly coupled with at least one positioning rod means (22a) at each of those end regions thereof opposing in the longitudinal direction of the railway lines. Said end support means (28) can be moved to rest on each end surface (88a, 102a) of the last moulded structures (16a) in the longitudinal direction of the railway lines, and at least one intermediate support means which can be coupled rigidly to at least one positioning rod means in an intermediate region thereof arranged between the end regions, and can be moved substantially in the longitudinal direction of the railway lines to rest on a stop surface provided on the moulded structures (16a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19623135 A1 19971211; AU 3094397 A 19980107; DE 29724751 U1 20030814; EP 0904463 A1 19990331; EP 0904463 B1 20030611; EP 1306486 A2 20030502; EP 1306486 A3 20030521; WO 9747818 A1 19971218

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59710274

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59710274

- Representative's name: RUTTENSPERGER LACHNIT TROSSIN GOMOLL PATENT- U, DE

2014-01-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KRAIBURG STRAIL GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUMMIWERK KRAIBURG ELASTIK GMBH, 84529 TITTMONING, DE

- Document: DE 59710274

- Effective date: 20131120

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59710274

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20131120

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59710274

- Representative's name: RUTTENSPERGER LACHNIT TROSSIN GOMOLL PATENT- U, DE

- Effective date: 20131120

2013-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59710274

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710274 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981209

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE