Global patent index - EP 0904467 B1

EP 0904467 B1 2000-03-01 - ROTARY MECHANISM CONTROL WITH POWER SUPPLY

Title (en)

ROTARY MECHANISM CONTROL WITH POWER SUPPLY

Title (de)

DREHWERKSTEUERUNG MIT SPEISEEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

COMMANDE DE MECANISME ROTATIF A SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION

Publication

EP 0904467 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918141 A

Priority

  • DE 19620665 A
  • EP 9701920 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19620665C1] The invention relates to a hydraulic control, especially for the rotary mechanism of an excavator. In a drive circuit there are a hydraulic drive pump (2) and a hydraulic drive motor connected via operating lines (4, 3). The hydraulic control comprises an adjuster (9) to adjust a piston (12) fitted between two setting pressure chambers (10, 11) and acting on the displacement volume of a hydraulic drive pump (2). There is also a pre-control unit (8) which applies an adjusting pressure to one of the setting pressure chambers (10, 11) depending on the pressure difference between two control lines (6, 7). According to the embodiment of the inventin, the pre-control unit (8) is connected to a supply line (30) via a pressure regulating valve (56), and, in a pilot position (42, 43), the pre-control unit (8) connects one of the two setting pressure chambers (10, 11) via the pressure regulating valve (56) to the supply line (30) and the other chamber (11, 10) to a pressurising fluid tank (17). In a neutral position (61), both setting pressure chambers (10, 11) are connected to the supply line (30) via the pressure regulating valve (56).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/12; E02F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/22 (2006.01); E02F 9/12 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/08 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/123 (2013.01); E02F 9/128 (2013.01); E02F 9/2285 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01); F04B 49/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19620665 C1 19970612; EP 0904467 A1 19990331; EP 0904467 B1 20000301; JP 2000510933 A 20000822; US 6167702 B1 20010102; WO 9744535 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090418

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070417

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080417

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701185

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980720

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE