Global Patent Index - EP 0904485 B1

EP 0904485 B1 2000-03-22 - SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING THE RICHNESS IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING THE RICHNESS IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR REGELUNG DES LUFT/KRAFTSTOFF-VERHÄLTNISSES IN EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE LA RICHESSE DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0904485 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97927249 A

Priority

  • FR 9701005 W
  • FR 9607232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747868A1] The invention discloses a system for adjusting the richness of the air-fuel mixture injected into an engine. It is characterised in that the adjusting device is of the "Smith predictor" type (30) that comprises at least one control loop (36, 38) which computes a first estimated correction value delta of the richness RISUIV which takes into account the delay introduced by the engine (10). The invention is useful for fuel injection internal combustion engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1481 (2013.01); F02D 41/1401 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1426 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1431 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1433 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1434 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747868 A1 19971218; DE 69701526 D1 20000427; DE 69701526 T2 20000921; EP 0904485 A1 19990331; EP 0904485 B1 20000322; FR 2749613 A1 19971212; FR 2749613 B1 19980731

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701526

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701526 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981119

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT