Global Patent Index - EP 0904518 B1

EP 0904518 B1 2001-12-19 - PROCESS FOR STARTING AN INSTALLATION FOR LOW TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION AND INSTALLATION FOR LOW TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR STARTING AN INSTALLATION FOR LOW TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION AND INSTALLATION FOR LOW TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ANFAHREN EINER ANLAGE ZUR TIEFTEMPERATURZERLEGUNG VON LUFT UND ANLAGE ZUR TIEFTEMPERATURZERLEGUNG VON LUFT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE EN MARCHE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE SEPARATION DE L'AIR A BASSE TEMPERATURE ET INSTALLATION DE SEPARATION DE L'AIR A BASSE TEMPERATURE

Publication

EP 0904518 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97921813 A

Priority

  • DE 19617377 A
  • EP 9702188 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19617377A1] An installation has at least one distillation column (7) in which a more volatile fraction (10), in particular nitrogen, is generated, as well as at least one source of refrigerated liquid. When starting the installation after an interruption, at least temporarily refrigerated liquid (22) is led from a given moment in time t0 from this source into a top area of the distillation column (7). No air (6) is introduced into the distillation column (7) between the starting moment t0 and a later moment in time t1 > t0.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04478 (2013.01); F25J 3/04254 (2013.01); F25J 3/0443 (2013.01); F25J 3/04824 (2013.01); F25J 2200/54 (2013.01); F25J 2200/90 (2013.01); F25J 2210/42 (2013.01); F25J 2215/44 (2013.01); F25J 2245/42 (2013.01); F25J 2250/42 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19617377 A1 19971106; EP 0904518 A1 19990331; EP 0904518 B1 20011219; ES 2170951 T3 20020816; PT 904518 E 20020531; WO 9741400 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100429

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101028

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2011-01-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100428

2010-11-08 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101028

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090508

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-01-15 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Owner name: LINDE AG, DE

- Effective date: 20080104

2005-05-04 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20041211

2002-11-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170951 T3

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705898 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-05-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR STARTING AN INSTALLATION FOR LOW TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION AND INSTALLATION FOR LOW TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981109

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT