Global Patent Index - EP 0904612 B1

EP 0904612 B1 2001-12-12 - PIN BUSHING

Title (en)

PIN BUSHING

Title (de)

KONTAKTSTIFTBUCHSE

Title (fr)

DOUILLE DE BROCHE

Publication

EP 0904612 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97925991 A

Priority

  • DE 19623838 A
  • DE 19653441 A
  • EP 9703013 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748149A1] The present invention relates to a pin bushing (1) with a receiving part (2) for a pin (4) and a side connection part (3). The receiving part (2) forms a bushing (5) with a base (6), two side walls (7a, 7b) and a roof zone (8), the roof zone (8) comprising at least two tongues (9) alternatively radiating from different side walls (7a, 7b) and extending transversely of the plug-in direction, said tongues being bent over inwards into the bushing (5) in the top zone of the opposite side walls (7a, 7b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/115 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748149 A1 19971218; AT 210900 T 20011215; BR 9709712 A 19990810; CA 2257604 A1 19971218; EP 0904612 A1 19990331; EP 0904612 B1 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030610

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030610

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709097 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210900 T 20011215

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990324

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981231

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE