Global patent index - EP 0904713 A3

EP 0904713 A3 2000-05-03 - Swinging supporting frame for a chair seat and back

Title (en)

Swinging supporting frame for a chair seat and back

Title (de)

Schwenkbarer Stützrahmen für einen Sitz oder Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Cadre de support pivotant pour siège et dossier

Publication

EP 0904713 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98105311 A

Priority

IT PC970026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0904713A2] A swinging supporting frame for a chair seat and back, comprising: a sustantially horizontal arm (1) for fastening a chair seat; a telescopic rod (2) supporting the chair back and being hinged to said arm (1); one or more springs (40) acting on said vertical rod to push the chair back forward; a spacer (44) inserted between the walls (5) of said horizontal arm; and screw means (16) for pressing the walls of said telescopic rod (2) against the walls (5) of said arm (1) and against said spacer (44) to lock the chair back in position, wherein said springs (40) are helical springs inserted onto the hinge pin (6) which is fitted on said arm (1) and said telescopic rod (2), one of the ends of said springs acting directly against the wall of said arm (1) and the other spring end acting against said rod, in particular against said spacer (44) inserted on said clamping screw means. A plurality of friction plates (10) are arranged between said spacer (44) and the walls of said arm (1), and in order to position and set up said plates (10), said frame includes a pair of teeth (8, 9) obtained in the walls (5) of said arm by blanking and drawing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/027 (2006.01); A47C 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/44 (2013.01); A47C 1/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0904713 A2 19990331; EP 0904713 A3 20000503; CA 2230107 A1 19990322; IT 1296230 B1 19990618; IT PC970026 A1 19990322; IT PC970026 D0 19970922

INPADOC legal status

2001-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001003

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI