Global Patent Index - EP 0904760 B1

EP 0904760 B1 2002-11-06 - Cross-strut for foldable wheelchair

Title (en)

Cross-strut for foldable wheelchair

Title (de)

Kreuzstrebe für einen Faltrollstuhl

Title (fr)

Entretoise croisée pour fauteuil roulant

Publication

EP 0904760 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115226 A

Priority

DE 19742267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0904760A1] The cross members (2) for a folding wheelchair, have an upper (2a) and lower (2b) member sections, where one section (2b) has a telescopic movement within the other section (2a). Both sections (2a,2b) have a row of holes (3), which correspond with each other.The intersection linkage (1) is formed by a bolt, and the like, through the drilling (3a) of one row of holes and the aligned drilling of the other row, and through the connected members. The intersection link (1) is always at the center of the crossed members.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/02 (2006.01); A61G 5/08 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/08 (2013.01); A61G 5/0825 (2016.11); A61G 5/1062 (2013.01); Y10S 297/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0904760 A1 19990331; EP 0904760 B1 20021106; DE 19742267 A1 19990408; DE 19742267 C2 19991021; JP 3839596 B2 20061101; JP H11164852 A 19990622; US 6050582 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806168

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120813

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806168 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OTTO BOCK HEALTHCARE GMBH

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI