Global patent index - EP 0904840 A3

EP 0904840 A3 2000-01-19 - Apparatus for drawing liquids into and expelling liquids from a pipet at variable flow rates

Title (en)

Apparatus for drawing liquids into and expelling liquids from a pipet at variable flow rates

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufsaugen und Ausschenken von Flüssigkeiten in einer Pipette mit variablen Fliessgeschwindigkeiten

Title (fr)

Appareil d'aspiration et de décharge de liquides d'une pipette à débits variables

Publication

EP 0904840 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98307455 A

Priority

US 6048597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0904840A2] A pipet gun for drawing liquids into and dispensing liquids from a pipet which includes a variable flow valve assembly. The valve assembly includes a valve which is capable of accommodating a plurality of flow rates, and which is progressively adjustable during pipetting between a first air flow rate and a second air flow rate which is in excess of the first flow rate and which is non-progressively adjustable during pipetting to a third air flow rate which is substantially greater than the second air flow rate. The valve assembly further includes a threshold detector in the form of a spring detent, which provides an indication to the operator that the pipet gun is operating at the increased fluid rate, i.e., the "express mode" of operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/021 (2013.01); B01L 3/0213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0904840 A2 19990331; EP 0904840 A3 20000119; JP H11165080 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031204

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI