Global Patent Index - EP 0904851 A3

EP 0904851 A3 2000-03-01 - Door panel

Title (en)

Door panel

Title (de)

Türfüllung

Title (fr)

Panneau de porte

Publication

EP 0904851 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118187 A

Priority

DE 19742298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0904851A2] The door panel (5) and the ornamental profiles (17) fastened to it, are powder-coated continuously and with the same color. The profiles have at least localized electrical conductivity so that they are completed powder-coated. The profiles are fastened to the door panel via metal anchors (19), which also form an electrically conductive connection to the metal plate (14) in the door panel. The profiles contain plastic- metal powder mix, e.g. aluminum or another non-iron metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/04; E06B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/04 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/045 (2013.01); B05D 1/04 (2013.01); E06B 3/7001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 4035466 A1 19920514 - GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]
  • [A] EP 0274707 A2 19880720 - PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]
  • [A] ELMOURSI A A ET AL: "ELECTROSTATIC PAINTING OF PLASTICS USING METAL BACKING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1053-1057, XP000439260, ISSN: 0093-9994

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0904851 A2 19990331; EP 0904851 A3 20000301; DE 19742298 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI