Global Patent Index - EP 0904868 B1

EP 0904868 B1 2001-12-19 - structural element and method for making a structural element for motor vehicles

Title (en)

structural element and method for making a structural element for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Strukturbauteil und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Strukturbauteils für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

élément de structure et méthode de fabrication d' un élément de structure pour des véhicules à moteur

Publication

EP 0904868 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116626 A

Priority

DE 19742817 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0904868A1] The printed circuit board comprises a metal base sheet and a strengthening metal which is mounted on the metal base (4), and which covers it at least partially. Passage apertures (2) are formed as free areas in the strengthening metal (1). An Independent claim is included for the manufacture of the arrangement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/00; B21D 49/00; B62D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/00 (2006.01); B21D 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/00 (2013.01); B21D 35/007 (2013.01); B21D 49/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0904868 A1 19990331; EP 0904868 B1 20011219; DE 19742817 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802511

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-09-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-09-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040902

2003-09-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802511 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STRUCTURAL ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MAKING A STRUCTURAL ELEMENT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

2000-09-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STRUCTURAL ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MAKING A STRUCTURAL ELEMENT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000419

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI