Global Patent Index - EP 0904917 B1

EP 0904917 B1 2003-06-04 - Method for manufacturing a joint assembly of a sun visor and sun visor obtained by this method

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a joint assembly of a sun visor and sun visor obtained by this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Gelenkanordnung einer Sonnenblende und nach diesem Verfahren erhaltene Sonnenblende

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un ensemble d'articulation de pare-soleil et pare-soleil obtenu selon ce procédé

Publication

EP 0904917 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402401 A

Priority

FR 9712114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0904917A1] Motor vehicle sun visor articulated joint manufacturing procedure comprises molding components in sequence from two different thermoplastics which are chemically incompatible. The procedure comprises molding an angled shaft (3) and bearings (7) from one thermoplastic material, using a rotary mold and a press for two materials. After the mold has been opened and rotated through 180 degrees the components (5, 6, 8) needed to connect the articulated joint to the vehicle bodywork and sun visor are molded onto the shaft, using a second thermoplastic material with a greater contraction than the first and chemically incompatible with it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/00; B60J 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/00 (2006.01); B60J 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60J 3/0265 (2013.01); B29C 45/0017 (2013.01); B60J 3/0217 (2013.01); B60J 3/0226 (2013.01); B60J 3/0252 (2013.01); B29C 2045/002 (2013.01); B29C 2045/1601 (2013.01); B29L 2031/3035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0904917 A1 19990331; EP 0904917 B1 20030604; DE 69815241 D1 20030710; DE 69815241 T2 20040408; ES 2201423 T3 20040316; FR 2768959 A1 19990402; FR 2768959 B1 19991203; PT 904917 E 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031001

2004-10-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-05-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201423 T3

2003-10-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815241 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT PT SE

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990909

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI