Global Patent Index - EP 0905000 B1

EP 0905000 B1 2001-05-16 - Intermediate floor for a two level coach

Title (en)

Intermediate floor for a two level coach

Title (de)

Zwischenboden für einen Doppelstockwagen

Title (fr)

Plancher intermédiaire pour une voiture à deux niveaux

Publication

EP 0905000 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117959 A

Priority

DE 19742772 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905000A1] The intermediate floor (4) consists of several flat rectangular sandwich elements (5) next to each other. These are positioned with their narrow end faces extending from one carriage side (9) to the other. The elements are supported on carrier struts (8) extending along the sides in longitudinal carriage direction (10). The long sides of the elements are connected to hollow bendable beams extending across the inner width of the carriage. Struts and beams are rectangular tubes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 1/06; B61D 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 1/06 (2006.01); B61D 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 1/06 (2013.01); B61D 17/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905000 A1 19990331; EP 0905000 B1 20010516; AT 201175 T 20010615; DE 19742772 A1 19990408; DE 19742772 C2 19990909

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160922

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201175 T

- Effective date: 20160922

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800714

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TALBOT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2002-09-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020910

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010817

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800714 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201175 T 20010615

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990129

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI