Global Patent Index - EP 0905025 B1

EP 0905025 B1 2000-07-12 - Strapping apparatus

Title (en)

Strapping apparatus

Title (de)

Umreifungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de cerclage

Publication

EP 0905025 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97116828 A

Priority

EP 97116828 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905025A1] The appts. has a wrapping frame (22) and a welding unit (20) to weld the ends of the tie strip when in place. The wrapping frame (22) covers a plane which is parallel to the conveyor. The welding unit (20) is at the center under the material support surface (16). The swing axis (24) of the wrapping frame (22) is generally vertically below the welding unit (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/06; B65B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/06 (2006.01); B65B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/08 (2013.01); B65B 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905025 A1 19990331; EP 0905025 B1 20000712; DK 0905025 T3 20001016; ES 2149535 T3 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090928

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090928

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091001

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090927

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090927

2010-05-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-05-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-12-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080909

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080905

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050927

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149535 T3

2000-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-12-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB LI

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990427

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990226

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB LI