Global Patent Index - EP 0905033 B1

EP 0905033 B1 2002-11-13 - Glass or ceramic bottle

Title (en)

Glass or ceramic bottle

Title (de)

Glas- oder Keramikflasche

Title (fr)

Flacon verre ou céramique comportant un élément rapporté

Publication

EP 0905033 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402136 A

Priority

FR 9712019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905033A1] The bottle (1), made with a body (2) of glass or a ceramic material and a shoulder covering (4) with an aperture (5), has a bush (7) of a different material set in the aperture to receive a stopper (15) or dispensing cap. The bush (7) is made from a thermoplastic material and has a shoulder or collar (12) limiting its penetration into the bottle aperture, while its projecting outer portion has a covering (14) of metal or plastics, or a threaded surface for a screw-on cap or dispensing head. A stopper (15) which fits into the bush has a shank (17) covered by a thermoplastic sleeve (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 13/02; B65D 1/02; B65D 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 1/48 (2006.01); B65D 13/02 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3047 (2013.01); B05B 11/0013 (2013.01); B65D 1/023 (2013.01); B65D 1/48 (2013.01); B65D 13/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905033 A1 19990331; EP 0905033 B1 20021113; DE 69809361 D1 20021219; DE 69809361 T2 20030403; ES 2186986 T3 20030516; FR 2769003 A1 19990402; FR 2769003 B1 19991119; US 6227392 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070828

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060829

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060829

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050825

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186986 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809361 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI