Global Patent Index - EP 0905049 B1

EP 0905049 B1 2003-06-25 - Container for a three-component product

Title (en)

Container for a three-component product

Title (de)

Behälter für ein Dreikomponenten-Produkt

Title (fr)

Conditionnement pour un produit à trois composants

Publication

EP 0905049 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401660 A

Priority

FR 9711887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905049A1] The container has three sub-containers or compartments (6, 8, 12) each retaining a component (A, B, C). The first has an open base and middle section (30) with a central channel (32) and removable cap (36) allowing base closure. The second has a neck (50) engaging in the channel, sealed by a plug (46). When the plug is withdrawn, the neck inserts into the central channel, expelling the cap, allowing mixing of the components. The second compartment retains a third, having a free edge (12a) forming an opening sealed by the plug during storage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3211 (2013.01); B65D 81/3222 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905049 A1 19990331; EP 0905049 B1 20030625; DE 69815776 D1 20030731; DE 69815776 T2 20040429; ES 2201422 T3 20040316; FR 2768705 A1 19990326; FR 2768705 B1 19991119

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-30 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20051214

2006-08-30 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20051214

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KPSS-KAO PROFESSIONAL SALON SERVICES GMBH

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201422 T3

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815776 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020208

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI