Global Patent Index - EP 0905052 B1

EP 0905052 B1 2002-09-11 - Storage and dispensing device for a liquid or semi-liquid product

Title (en)

Storage and dispensing device for a liquid or semi-liquid product

Title (de)

Aufbewahrungs- und Ausgabevorrichtung für flüssige oder halbflüssige Produkte

Title (fr)

Ensemble de conditionnement et de distribution d'un produit liquide ou semi liquide

Publication

EP 0905052 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402116 A

Priority

FR 9711577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905052A1] A container and dispenser for liquid products having a fixed outlet nozzle is provided with a push button type dispenser pump operated by a linkage system. A unit (1) for packaging and dispensing of a product contained in a reservoir (12) surmounted by a distributor unit (30) having a hollow stem (33) with an axis A. The operating means for the distributor has a support surface (38) and a rotary coupling (100,101) between the hollow stem and press button (34). This button, in response to pressure exerted on the support surface outside the axis A of the hollow stem, causes a movement of the activating means around the axis of the hollow stem, in a cone of which the summit is situated on the axis A of the stem and transmitted to the hollow stem. This exerts a force along the axis of the stem so as to cause a downwards displacement of the hollow stem and the expulsion of the product through an outlet (9). The device comprises a body (10) having an axis (X) forming the reservoir for the product, the product being dispensed via at least one orifice provided in the outlet. The outlet is connected to the distribution element by way of a flexible connecting tube (41) and is held immovably on a fixed portion (51) of the body surmounting the reservoir, the activating element being mounted independently of the fixed part of the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16; B05B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/20 (2013.01); B05B 11/3015 (2013.01); B05B 11/3056 (2013.01); B05B 15/654 (2018.02); B05B 11/0037 (2013.01); B05B 11/3011 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768409 A1 19990319; FR 2768409 B1 19991015; DE 69807804 D1 20021017; DE 69807804 T2 20030116; EP 0905052 A1 19990331; EP 0905052 B1 20020911; ES 2186112 T3 20030501; US 6073815 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070826

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060826

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060826

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186112 T3

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807804 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020422

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI