Global Patent Index - EP 0905084 B1

EP 0905084 B1 2001-03-21 - Apparatus for dispensing liquids, especially beverages

Title (en)

Apparatus for dispensing liquids, especially beverages

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abgeben von Flüssigkeiten, insbesondere Getränken

Title (fr)

Appareil de distribution de liquides, en particulier de boissons

Publication

EP 0905084 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402389 A

Priority

FR 9712128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905084A1] The dispenser comprises a housing (1) with an intermediate reservoir (21) and a collar (4) to receive the neck (19) of an inverted container. The collar has a lower wall (9) traversed by a sleeve (10) holding an outlet connector (11) linking the container to the intermediate reservoir. The intermediate reservoir (21) is equipped with a system for treating the liquid before it is dispensed, e.g. a heater, cooler (29) or gasifier. It is made from a food grade plastic with a relatively rigid upper section (26) and a supple lower section (25) which fits in a cooling chamber (28). The two sections are separated by a constriction (24) forming an external space filled by a thermal insulation material (55). The upper rigid section has a number of branches (43, 52, 54), e.g. for an outlet tube (44) for cooled liquid or other outlets for liquid at close to ambient temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/0009 (2013.01); B67D 3/0029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905084 A1 19990331; EP 0905084 B1 20010321; AT 199880 T 20010415; CA 2248475 A1 19990330; CA 2248475 C 20061010; DE 69800615 D1 20010426; DE 69800615 T2 20011018; DK 0905084 T3 20010625; ES 2156023 T3 20010601; FR 2769610 A1 19990416; FR 2769610 B1 20000107; GR 3035851 T3 20010831; HK 1019059 A1 20020628; PT 905084 E 20010928; US 5979709 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160909

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-04-08 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-20 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-06-20 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111014

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2010-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-02-26 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2009-06-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2009-05-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2009-04-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090312 AND 20090318

2008-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR2 AVENUE AMBROISE CROIZAT, FR-

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR2 AVENUE AMBROISE CROIZAT, FR-

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NESTLE WATERS DIRECT FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NESTLE WATERS POWWOW FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2008-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2008-07-14 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MISTRAL CONSTRUCTEUR SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-07-04 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NESTLE WATERS POWWOW FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20080624

2008-07-04 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: NESTLE WATERS DIRECT FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PD4A

- Effective date: 20080624

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070928

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-09-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070918

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-06-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156023

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800615

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199880

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000704

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990921

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI