Global Patent Index - EP 0905222 A3

EP 0905222 A3 2000-04-12 - Musk perfumes

Title (en)

Musk perfumes

Title (de)

Moschus-Riechstoffe

Title (fr)

Parfums de musc

Publication

EP 0905222 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117335 A

Priority

DE 19742307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905222A2] Use of mixtures of ethylenedodecanedioate and ethyleneundecanedioate in perfumery to impart a musk fragrance. The mixtures comprise ethylenedodecanedioate (I) and ethyleneundecanedioate (II) and contain 5-60 (30-50) wt. % (II) on total (I)+(II). Independent claims are included convering (A) perfume oils containing a proportion of the mixture (I)+(II) and (B) Products perfumed with the perfume mixture from (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11B 9/00; A61K 7/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/85 (2006.01); A61Q 13/00 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 9/0084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905222 A2 19990331; EP 0905222 A3 20000412; AU 729020 B2 20010125; AU 8707298 A 19990415; BR 9803591 A 20000208; CA 2248403 A1 19990325; DE 19742307 A1 19990401; JP H11209783 A 19990803; US 6034052 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030722

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI