Global Patent Index - EP 0905297 B1

EP 0905297 B1 2000-11-29 - Method for fabricating a knitted article, particularly on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for fabricating a knitted article, particularly on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks, insbesondere auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot, notamment dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0905297 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119208 A

Priority

DE 19739239 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739239C1] A fabric is knitted, esp. on a flat bed knitting machine, so that at least one part length of fabric in the knitting direction is made up of at least one section (S1,S3) in which at most every second needle forms a stitch and at least one section where every needle forms a stitch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/10; D04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/10 (2006.01); D04B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/10 (2013.01); D04B 7/28 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739239 C1 19981029; CN 100347367 C 20071107; CN 1210914 A 19990317; EP 0905297 A1 19990331; EP 0905297 B1 20001129; EP 0905297 B2 20040728; ES 2152615 T3 20010201; ES 2152615 T5 20050201; HK 1017912 A1 20080801; JP 2958697 B2 19991006; JP H11189954 A 19990713

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081105

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081105

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071105

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061101

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-02-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2005-01-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001129

2004-08-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2004-07-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-10-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ATELIER DE CONSTRUCTION STEIGER S.A.

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152615 T3

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702689 20010104

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990503

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990127

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI