Global Patent Index - EP 0905298 A3

EP 0905298 A3 2000-04-12 - Knitwear with several three-dimensional structures passing into one another by a continuous knitting process

Title (en)

Knitwear with several three-dimensional structures passing into one another by a continuous knitting process

Title (de)

Gestrick mit mehreren, im fortlaufenden Strickprozess ineinander übergehenden räumlichen Strukturen

Title (fr)

Tricot comportant plusieurs structures tri-dimensionelles passants l'un dans l'autre pendant un procédé de tricotage continu

Publication

EP 0905298 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115427 A

Priority

DE 19743074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905298A2] The article e.g. tights, is manufactured seamlessly on a flat knitting machine with at least two opposite needle beds. The article is adapted to the required spatial geometry through an even distribution of stitches courses of different widths and/or operations such as knit narrowing and/or through variation of the stitch size.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/243 (2013.01); D04B 1/108 (2013.01); D04B 1/123 (2013.01); D04B 1/18 (2013.01); D10B 2509/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905298 A2 19990331; EP 0905298 A3 20000412; CN 1213022 A 19990407; DE 19743074 A1 19990401; US 6196030 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI