Global Patent Index - EP 0905330 A3

EP 0905330 A3 2000-08-23 - Connection device for infill panels

Title (en)

Connection device for infill panels

Title (de)

Befestigungsteil für Ausfachungstafeln

Title (fr)

Fixation pour panneaux de remplissage

Publication

EP 0905330 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117401 A

Priority

IT MI972193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905330A2] A connection device for prefabricated infill panels which connects a supported outer layer (1) to a supporting inner layer (2) without interrupting the continuity of the insulating layer (3) or of a ventilation chamber; this connection device for the two layers (1, 2) comprises for the supported layer (1) a support element (4) which by applying a guide also becomes a unidirectional sliding element for the differential expansion of the two layers, and also comprises retention elements (6) which allow even considerable relative sliding of the two layers in every direction without fatigue phenomena arising. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74; E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905330 A2 19990331; EP 0905330 A3 20000823; EP 0905330 B1 20060111; AT 315695 T 20060215; DE 69833153 D1 20060406; ES 2256906 T3 20060716; IT 1295087 B1 19990427; IT MI972193 A1 19990326

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120915

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111010

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-09-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256906 T3

2006-06-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-04-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833153 P 20060406

2006-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI PT

2006-01-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2006-01-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041207

2001-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DLC S.R.L.

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB LI PT

2001-05-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20010221

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI PT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI