Global Patent Index - EP 0905357 A3

EP 0905357 A3 2000-07-19 - Cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine, especially for vehicle

Title (en)

Cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine, especially for vehicle

Title (de)

Kühlkreislauf einer Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne, notamment pour des véhicules

Publication

EP 0905357 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115432 A

Priority

DE 19743084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905357A2] A liquid cooling system for an IC engine (2), with the radiator (5) at a lower height than the engine thermostat (4) has a pressure control line (13,13') between the thermostat and the radiator to vent any trapped air back into the radiator. The top of the radiator is connected to the bottom of the header tank (10) by a pressure compensating duct (11) and hence any trapped air is eventually ducted to the header tank, from where it is vented by a pressure relief valve (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905357 A2 19990331; EP 0905357 A3 20000719; EP 0905357 B1 20031105; ES 2209017 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209017 T3

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810069 P 20031211

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010113

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI