Global Patent Index - EP 0905447 B1

EP 0905447 B1 2002-11-27 - Vaporising device for liquid fuels

Title (en)

Vaporising device for liquid fuels

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verdampfen von flüssigen Brennstoffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de vaporisation pour combustibles liquides

Publication

EP 0905447 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117444 A

Priority

DE 19743087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905447A2] The evaporator has an electrically heated capillary tube (10) with a bore diameter (d) of 0.3-2.0 mm, a length (L) of 500-3000 times the bore diameter, and a wall thickness of 2.0-0.5 times the bore diameter, in which the liquid fuel is evaporated. The chrome-nickel steel tube can be helically- or spirally-wound and can be electrically heated with a directly applied voltage no greater than about 50 V, or indirectly by a resistance heater element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/22; B01D 1/00; F23D 11/40; F23D 11/44; F23K 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/40 (2006.01); F23D 11/44 (2006.01); F23K 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/22 (2013.01); F23D 11/408 (2013.01); F23D 11/448 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905447 A2 19990331; EP 0905447 A3 19991124; EP 0905447 B1 20021127; AT 228631 T 20021215; DE 19743087 A1 19990527; DK 0905447 T3 20030407

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-03-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-03-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040311

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-07 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806423 20030109

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228631 T 20021215

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020114

2000-09-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000506

2000-08-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI

2000-08-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6F 23K 5/22 A, 6F 23K 5/20 B, 6F 23D 11/44 B, 6B 01D 1/00 B, 6F 23D 11/40 B

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI