Global Patent Index - EP 0905450 A3

EP 0905450 A3 2000-04-26 - Kitchen range

Title (en)

Kitchen range

Title (de)

Küchenherd

Title (fr)

Fourneau de cuisine

Publication

EP 0905450 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98660090 A

Priority

FI 973814 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905450A2] Kitchen range comprising a baking oven (1), a first smoke duct (3) to convey the combustion gases from the baking oven into a chimney flue, and a range top (5). The baking oven (1) constitutes the only wood combustion chamber in the kitchen range. The first smoke duct (3) conveys the combustion gases from the baking oven directly into the chimney flue, and the kitchen range comprises a second smoke duct (2), which conveys the combustion gases from the baking oven via the range top (5) into the chimney flue. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/20; A21B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/04 (2006.01); F24B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/04 (2013.01); F24B 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905450 A2 19990331; EP 0905450 A3 20000426; EP 0905450 B1 20030115; AT 231231 T 20030215; DE 69810727 D1 20030220; DE 69810727 T2 20031016; FI 102450 B1 19981215; FI 102450 B 19981215; FI 973814 A0 19970926

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-05-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080909

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2008-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NUNNAUUNI OY

- Free text: NUNNANLAHDEN UUNI OY#JOENSUUNTIE 1344C#83940 NUNNANLAHTI (FI) -TRANSFER TO- NUNNAUUNI OY#JOENSUUNTIE 1344 C#83940 NUNNANLAHTI (FI)

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030911

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-12-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-04-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810727 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030115

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI