Global Patent Index - EP 0905451 B1

EP 0905451 B1 2003-06-04 - Atmospheric burner on a glass ceramic cooking hob

Title (en)

Atmospheric burner on a glass ceramic cooking hob

Title (de)

Atmosphärischer Gasbrenner mit einer Kochmulde mit einer Kochfläche aus Glaskeramik

Title (fr)

Brûleur atmosphérique dans une plaque de cuisson en vitro-céramique

Publication

EP 0905451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116932 A

Priority

DE 19742792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742792C1] The assembly for an atmospheric gas burner (9) at a shaped cooker hotplate, of glass or ceramic materials, is a multi-part structure with the parts pressed together from above at the edge of the opening (14) at the shaped body (1) of the hotplate. Part of the hotplate body (1) structure (16) grips over as a collar (6) in a ring disc or frame shape, with inserted seals (5). The edge of the free inner section of the collar (6) forms a counter surface for the burner (9). A further part of the structure (13) is held from below by a spring unit (4) as a mounting and a counter surface at the under side of the shaped hotplate (1). The spring (4) exerts a force (F) to press the gas burner (9) against the shaped hotplate by pressure on the seal (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742792 C1 19981119; EP 0905451 A1 19990331; EP 0905451 B1 20030604; ES 2197402 T3 20040101; PL 328841 A1 19990329; US 6032662 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050910

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050910

2005-09-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2004-09-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040907

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030908

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197402 T3

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808594 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ATMOSPHERIC BURNER ON A GLASS CERAMIC COOKING HOB

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980908

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI