Global patent index - EP 0905455 A4

EP 0905455 A4 2000-04-05 - OUTDOOR UNIT OF SEPARATE TYPE AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

OUTDOOR UNIT OF SEPARATE TYPE AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

AUSSENEINHEIT FÜR KLIMAANLAGE MIT GETRENNTEN GERÄTEN

Title (fr)

UNITE EXTERIEURE D'UN CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR DE TYPE SEPARE

Publication

EP 0905455 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98902248 A

Priority

  • JP 9800636 W
  • JP 8375997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905455A1] An outdoor unit for use in an air conditioner has a propeller fan (2) disposed in a casing (1), and an outlet grille (4) disposed on an outlet side of the propeller fan (2). The outlet grille (4) has a square outlet opening (8) and has a plurality of blades (5) disposed in parallel with one another at given intervals in the outlet opening (8). With respect to a plane (P) which intersects with lines extending along lengths of the blades (5) at a given angle () in a rotational direction of the fan and which includes the central axis of the fan (2), a difference exists between an inlet angle ( alpha A) of portions (5A) of the blades (5) positioned in an area (C1) on one side of the plane (P) and an inlet angle ( alpha B) of portions (5B) of the blades (5) positioned in an area (C2) on the other side of the plane (P). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 5/00; F24F 1/00; F24F 13/075; F24F 13/08; F24F 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/00 (2006.01); F24F 1/40 (2011.01); F24F 1/56 (2011.01); F24F 13/075 (2006.01); F24F 13/08 (2006.01); F24F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/56 (2013.01); F04D 29/667 (2013.01); F04D 29/703 (2013.01); F24F 13/075 (2013.01); F24F 13/08 (2013.01); F24F 13/24 (2013.01); F24F 13/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905455 A1 19990331; EP 0905455 A4 20000405; EP 0905455 B1 20030502; AU 5881398 A 19981022; AU 731727 B2 20010405; CN 1143094 C 20040324; CN 1222965 A 19990714; DE 69813985 D1 20030605; DE 69813985 T2 20040219; ES 2198043 T3 20040116; ID 21819 A 19990729; JP H10281499 A 19981023; KR 20000015827 A 20000315; WO 9844299 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1017418

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040218

2005-02-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198043

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69813985

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2003-05-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-11-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: OUTDOOR UNIT OF AN AIR CONDITIONER

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020411

2000-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24F 5/00 A, 7F 24F 13/08 B, 7F 24F 1/00 B, 7F 24F 13/075 B, 7F 24F 13/24 B

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981119

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT