Global patent index - EP 0905456 A3

EP 0905456 A3 2001-04-11 - Three-pass boiler

Title (en)

Three-pass boiler

Title (de)

Dreizugheizkessel

Title (fr)

Chaudière à trois passages

Publication

EP 0905456 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118049 A

Priority

  • DE 19742783 A
  • DE 29812566 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905456A2] In the free space between the ribs (2) a combustion chamber casing (5) backwardly limited by a wall forms the first draft (I). The inner space (5') of the casing is connected to the second draft (II). The second draft evolves from a burner-side overflow chamber (6) into a third draft leading to a flue gas collection chamber (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905456 A2 19990331; EP 0905456 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI