Global Patent Index - EP 0905458 A3

EP 0905458 A3 2000-05-17 - Gas fired water heater with flue gas control

Title (en)

Gas fired water heater with flue gas control

Title (de)

Gasbeheizter Wassererhitzer mit Abgasüberwachungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Chauffe-eau à gaz avec dispositif pour la surveillance du gaz de combustion

Publication

EP 0905458 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110113 A

Priority

DE 29717072 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905458A2] The monitor has a temperature sensor (16) for detecting a build up of flue gases located outside the casing (10) of the draught diverter. It is positioned at the height of an opening provided in the flue pipe socket (12). Under normal conditions it is unaffected by heat radiation from the casing and should there be a back draught is heated by the flow of flue gas from the opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717072 U1 19990204; EP 0905458 A2 19990331; EP 0905458 A3 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030120

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI