Global Patent Index - EP 0905585 A3

EP 0905585 A3 2001-03-21 - A process cartridge having a shutter to cover the surface of a photoconductor and image forming apparatus using the same cartridge

Title (en)

A process cartridge having a shutter to cover the surface of a photoconductor and image forming apparatus using the same cartridge

Title (de)

Arbeitseinheit mit einem Abdeckteil zum Abdecken von der Oberfläche eines photoleitenden Materials und Bilderzeugungsgerät mit einer solchen Einheit

Title (fr)

Unité de traitement comprenant un couvercle pour recouvrir la surface d'un photoconducteur et appareil de formation d'images utilisant cette unité

Publication

EP 0905585 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98116499 A

Priority

JP 24236597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905585A2] A process cartridge for an image forming apparatus, which includes a cartridge main body having at least one of a developing device for developing with toner a latent image on a photoconductor and a cleaner for salvaging the toner remaining on a surface of the photoconductor and detachably mounted to a main body of the image forming apparatus, and a shutter which covers a covering area including an area beneath a lower part of the circumferential surface of the photoconductor and an area beneath a lower part of at least one of a boundary between the photoconductor and the developing device and a boundary between the photoconductor and the cleaner. The shutter moves in a substantially horizontal posture between the covering area and a siding area beneath the developing device or the cleaner. Therefore, toner received by the shutter is prevented from falling from the shutter when the shutter is moved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2006.01); G03G 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/1832 (2013.01); G03G 21/1628 (2013.01); G03G 2221/1609 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 253 (P - 395) 11 October 1985 (1985-10-11)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 055 (P - 260) 13 March 1984 (1984-03-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 163 (P - 290) 27 July 1984 (1984-07-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905585 A2 19990331; EP 0905585 A3 20010321; EP 0905585 B1 20070606; CN 1109940 C 20030528; CN 1210997 A 19990317; DE 69837871 D1 20070719; DE 69837871 T2 20071018; ES 2287966 T3 20071216; HK 1019488 A1 20030919; JP 3484326 B2 20040106; JP H1184868 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-06-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69837871

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080307

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2287966

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69837871

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-07-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020815

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI