Global Patent Index - EP 0905977 A3

EP 0905977 A3 2001-02-07 - Image synthesis apparatus

Title (en)

Image synthesis apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bildsynthese

Title (fr)

Appareil de synthèse d'image

Publication

EP 0905977 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118230 A

Priority

JP 26613497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0905977A2] In the case where an image of a document or the like is taken by an economical camera in a TV conference system and the image is transmitted and received through a communication line, when an image of the whole of the document is taken, small characters are defaced and illegible, and, when an imaging operation is performed with a resolution at which characters are readable, it is impossible to take an image of the whole of the document. An image F1 at time T1 which is taken while moving an imaging section (1) is captured into an image storing section (2) and a feature point extracting section (3). The feature point extracting section (3) extracts feature points of the image F1. An image F2 at time T2 when the subsequent frame is started is captured into the image storing section (2) and the feature point extracting section (3). The image F2 in a region designated by a search range determining section (4), and the feature points of the image F1 are subject to a calculation in a correlation calculating section (5), to obtain a motion amount, and then a high-resolution image is synthesized. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01); H04N 5/262 (2006.01); H04N 7/15 (2006.01); H04N 7/173 (2011.01); H04N 7/18 (2006.01); H04N 19/00 (2014.01); H04N 1/195 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/54 (2014.11); H04N 1/19594 (2013.01); H04N 1/3876 (2013.01); H04N 5/2624 (2013.01); H04N 1/195 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0414 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0905977 A2 19990331; EP 0905977 A3 20010207; EP 0905977 B1 20101110; DE 69841993 D1 20101223; JP 3966392 B2 20070829; JP H11112956 A 19990423; US 2001055429 A1 20011227; US 6434276 B2 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130925

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69841993

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130925

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69841993

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20110811

2010-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69841993

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-12-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061120

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI