Global Patent Index - EP 0906039 B1

EP 0906039 B1 2000-04-19 - UNIVERSAL TORSO PROTECTOR FOR SPORTS USE WITH HYDRO-PNEUMATIC SHOCK-ABSORBER SYSTEMS AND EPIDERMAL COOLING SYSTEMS

Title (en)

UNIVERSAL TORSO PROTECTOR FOR SPORTS USE WITH HYDRO-PNEUMATIC SHOCK-ABSORBER SYSTEMS AND EPIDERMAL COOLING SYSTEMS

Title (de)

OBERKÖRPERSCHUTZ FÜR SPORTGEBRAUCH MIT STOSSDEMPFUNGSSYSTEM UND KÜHLVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROTECTEUR DE TORSE UNIVERSEL A USAGES SPORTIFS, POURVU DE SYSTEMES HYDROPNEUMATIQUES D'ABSORPTION DES CHOCS ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE L'EPIDERME

Publication

EP 0906039 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97929485 A

Priority

  • IT 9700132 W
  • IT LI960008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: IT1288354B1] A torso protector for wearing next to the skin of a sports player comprises: (a) a bearing structure of 8 plastic or carbon fibre shield elements (1, 2, 4, 5) forming a light and comfortable housing; (b) a shock absorbing structure in the housing having padding and an auxiliary hydro-pneumatic shock absorbing system; (c) an epidermal cooling system having a chemical time controlled cold producing unit; (d) a heat sink unit; and (e) an electrical fan unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 13/005 (2006.01); A41D 13/015 (2006.01); A41D 13/05 (2006.01); A63B 71/08 (2006.01); A63B 71/12 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A62B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/0053 (2013.01); A41D 13/015 (2013.01); A41D 13/0518 (2013.01); A63B 71/081 (2013.01); A63B 71/12 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1208 (2013.01); A63B 2209/00 (2013.01); A63B 2209/023 (2013.01); A63B 2225/66 (2013.01); A63B 2244/19 (2013.01); A63B 2244/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

AU 3357697 A 19980210; DE 69701735 D1 20000525; DE 69701735 T2 20010208; EP 0906039 A1 19990407; EP 0906039 B1 20000419; IT 1288354 B1 19980922; IT LI960008 A1 19980119

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020612

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UFO PLAST DI CONSOLONI VITO E.C.S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011002

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010606

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010514

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701735

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990611

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981119

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT