Global Patent Index - EP 0906099 A4

EP 0906099 A4 2001-02-07 - A METHOD OF TREATING CANCER

Title (en)

A METHOD OF TREATING CANCER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS

Title (fr)

METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER

Publication

EP 0906099 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97921085 A

Priority

  • GB 9613599 A
  • US 9705328 W
  • US 1477396 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736587A1] The present invention relates to a method of treating cancer which comprises administering to a mammalian patient a compound which inhibits Raf and a compound which inhibits farnesyl protein transferase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44; A61K 31/495

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/4178 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 38/05 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/05 (2013.01); A61K 31/4439 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9630343 A1 19961003 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9712876 A1 19970410 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 9532987 A1 19951207 - ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
  • [Y] LANGE-CARTER C A ET AL: "A divergence in the MAP kinase regulatory network defined by MEK kinase and Raf", SCIENCE,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,,US, vol. 260, 16 April 1993 (1993-04-16), pages 315 - 319, XP002108364, ISSN: 0036-8075
  • [Y] KOHL N E ET AL: "PROTEIN FARNESYLTRANSFERASE INHIBITORS BLOCK THE GROWTH OF RAS-DEPENDENT TUMORS IN NUDE MICE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, vol. 91, no. 19, September 1994 (1994-09-01), pages 9141 - 9145, XP000882713, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [Y] JELINEK T ET AL: "RAS-INDUCED ACTIVATION OF RAF-1 IS DEPENDENT ON TYROSINE PHOSPHORYLATION", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 16, no. 3, 1 March 1996 (1996-03-01), pages 1027 - 1034, XP000574029, ISSN: 0270-7306
  • See also references of WO 9736587A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736587 A1 19971009; AU 2722197 A 19971022; AU 727939 B2 20010104; CA 2250232 A1 19971009; EP 0906099 A1 19990407; EP 0906099 A4 20010207; JP 2000504023 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE