Global Patent Index - EP 0906162 B1

EP 0906162 B1 2001-01-10 - STRIP CASTING PLANT

Title (en)

STRIP CASTING PLANT

Title (de)

BANDGIESSANLAGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE COULEE DE FEUILLARDS

Publication

EP 0906162 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97926984 A

Priority

  • DE 9701149 W
  • DE 19622928 A
  • DE 19636699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6192973B1] The cast steel strip must be supported, particularly after the casting device, to reduce stresses and mechanical deformations. A flexible support element, in particular, a chain with rolls, whose length can be changed by suitable adjustment devices, is arranged for the purpose of support after the casting device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0694 (2013.01); B22D 11/0631 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6192973 B1 20010227; AT 198561 T 20010115; AU 3164397 A 19980107; AU 727137 B2 20001207; BR 9709656 A 19990810; CA 2257366 A1 19971218; CA 2257366 C 20050809; CN 1084649 C 20020515; CN 1222873 A 19990714; CZ 290859 B6 20021016; CZ 9804014 A3 19990915; DK 0906162 T3 20010205; EP 0906162 A1 19990407; EP 0906162 B1 20010110; ES 2153199 T3 20010216; GR 3035611 T3 20010629; HU 218882 B 20001228; HU 9901523 A2 19990830; HU 9901523 A3 20000128; PL 183556 B1 20020628; PL 330403 A1 19990510; SK 167198 A3 19990507; SK 283520 B6 20030911; TR 9802540 T2 19990322; WO 9747410 A1 19971218

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150105

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702899

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-11 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20010400457

- Effective date: 20150105

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 198561 T

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-02-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-01-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702899

2013-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153199 T3

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702899 20010215

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL SE

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198561 T 20010115

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SALZGITTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHWERDTFEGER, KLAUS

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPITZER, KARL-HEINZ

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: URLAU, ULRICH

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANKE, DIETMAR

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STACHE, BERNFRIED

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KROOS, JOACHIM

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUDDENBERG, HEINO

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990624

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981124

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL SE