Global patent index - EP 0906195 B1

EP 0906195 B1 2000-05-10 - INSERT MEMBER FOR SUPPORTING AN OBJECT RELEASABLY ATTACHED THERETO

Title (en)

INSERT MEMBER FOR SUPPORTING AN OBJECT RELEASABLY ATTACHED THERETO

Title (de)

EINGEHEFTETES ELEMENT ZUR AUFNAHME EINES HERAUSNEHMBARENGEGENSTANDES.

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'ENCARTAGE SERVANT DE SUPPORT A UN OBJECT ASSOCIE DE FACON LIBERABLE AUDIT ELEMENT

Publication

EP 0906195 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97928330 A

Priority

  • FR 9701039 W
  • FR 9607434 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747477A1] An insert member (10) for supporting an object (50) releasably attached thereto, said member being made of a heat-shrinkable plastic sheet and consisting of a main portion (11) secured to a printed article (1), and an end portion (12) extending beyond one edge (3) of the printed article, said end portion (12) being folded and adhered or sealed to itself to form a housing projecting beyond said edge for receiving the object (50) to be supported. Said object (50) is tightly held in the housing by the heat-shrunk end portion (12), and means (16, 17) are also provided for releasing the object (50) from the housing by opening said end portion (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747477 A1 19971218; AT 192702 T 20000515; DE 69701982 D1 20000615; DE 69701982 T2 20001130; EP 0906195 A1 19990407; EP 0906195 B1 20000510; FR 2749800 A1 19971219; FR 2749800 B1 19980731

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SLEEVER INTERNATIONAL CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701982

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

2000-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192702

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991013

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981208

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL