Global Patent Index - EP 0906197 B1

EP 0906197 B1 2000-05-10 - FILE WITH A MODULAR STRUCTURE

Title (en)

FILE WITH A MODULAR STRUCTURE

Title (de)

AKTENORDNER MIT MODULAREM AUFBAU

Title (fr)

CLASSEUR A STRUCTURE MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 0906197 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96922837 A

Priority

EP 9602643 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748564A1] The invention relates to a file comprising members which can be assembled in the most simple manner. A back section (1) has wings (2, 3) arranged to be pivotable to the side. The cover (4) and back (5) of the file can be connected to each other by retaining strips (6, 7, 8) which can be inserted into the holding means. The one retaining strip (7, 8) is therefore provided with a clamp mechanism (71, 81) of a known type. The file according to the invention can be adapted at any time to the amount and the type of the contents thereof, and only, for example, the retaining strip (7, 8) with the clamp mechanism (71, 81) of the elements has to be changed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/00 (2006.01); B42D 1/00 (2006.01); B42F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/0073 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748564 A1 19971224; AT 192705 T 20000515; AU 6357296 A 19980107; AU 722483 B2 20000803; DE 59605211 D1 20000615; DK 0906197 T3 20001120; EP 0906197 A1 19990407; EP 0906197 B1 20000510; ES 2147386 T3 20000901; JP 2000512229 A 20000919; NZ 333381 A 20000623; US 5975576 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020619

2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOGEL JURGEN

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010713

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010623

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010618

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010618

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010614

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010613

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147386 T3

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605211 20000615

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192705 T 20000515

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO MASSARI S.R.L.

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990111

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE