Global Patent Index - EP 0906216 B1

EP 0906216 B1 2001-05-16 - BEARING SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR A TURRET IN MOORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ITS INSTALLATION

Title (en)

BEARING SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR A TURRET IN MOORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ITS INSTALLATION

Title (de)

AUFLAGERSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN VERANKERUNGSDREHTURM UND EINBAUVERFAHREN HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE SURFACE D'APPUI POUR TOURELLE D'AMARRAGE FUNICULAIRE ET PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION

Publication

EP 0906216 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97930112 A

Priority

  • US 9710609 W
  • US 1959596 P
  • US 87024797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748595A1] A bearing support structure is disclosed for a turret (10A) mounted for rotation within a well (50A) of a moored vessel. The bearing support structure has a turret bearing assembly (900A) which may tilt about a tilting axis (783A) relative to a lower bearing support structure (764A) mounted on the vessel. The turret bearing assembly (760A) has a retainer ring (794A) below a peripheral slot (782A) in a turret ring (102A); a segmented key (596A) fits in slot (782A). The retainer ring (794A) is supported on an annular abutment (780A) on turret ring (102A). A filler material (781A) is provided in an annular space or clearance between turret ring (102A) and retainer ring (794A) to tighten the joint therebetween. A construction method is also disclosed for first placing a mooring turret in the well of the vessel and later installing a bearing assembly between the vessel and the turret by lowering it over the top of the turret.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/50; B63B 22/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/507 (2013.01); F16C 19/381 (2013.01); F16C 35/06 (2013.01); F16C 19/505 (2013.01); F16C 2300/14 (2013.01); F16C 2326/00 (2013.01); F16C 2326/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK GB MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748595 A1 19971224; AU 3401897 A 19980107; AU 716003 B2 20000217; BR 9709831 A 19990810; CA 2258528 A1 19971224; CA 2258528 C 20021119; CN 1246096 A 20000301; DK 0906216 T3 20010910; EP 0906216 A1 19990407; EP 0906216 A4 20000105; EP 0906216 B1 20010516; JP 2002507164 A 20020305; NO 314793 B1 20030526; NO 985865 A 19990212; NO 985865 D0 19981214; NZ 333442 A 20000327; OA 10937 A 20030226; US 5893784 A 19990413

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040613

2005-01-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040613

2003-06-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2003-06-02 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20030602

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030501

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK GB MC NL

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-01-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DK GB MC NL

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 21/50 A, 7B 63B 22/02 B

1999-07-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOATMAN, TERRY, L.

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK GB MC NL