Global Patent Index - EP 0906239 B1

EP 0906239 B1 2000-11-02 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CROSSWINDING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CROSSWINDING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER CHANGIEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ENSOUPLAGE CROISE

Publication

EP 0906239 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916956 A

Priority

  • DE 19711546 A
  • EP 9801504 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842606A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling a crosswinding device driven by a step motor (4) and to a crosswinding device. The position of a traversing thread guide (8) that moves back and forth inside a crosswinding lifter is determined by the position of the rotor (5) of a step motor (4). The rotor (5) moves inside the stator of the step motor with several windings. According to the invention, movement of the rotor is controlled by a stator flow which is determined by a stator voltage (Us) produced by a flow control device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2821 (2013.01); B65H 54/2833 (2013.01); B65H 54/2884 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842606 A1 19981001; CN 1131839 C 20031224; CN 1220641 A 19990623; EP 0906239 A1 19990407; EP 0906239 B1 20001102; JP 2001516319 A 20010925; JP 4647043 B2 20110309; TR 199802005 T1 20010321; TW 492944 B 20020701; US 6008613 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170316

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800323

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090316

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800323 20001207

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HERMANN KAHLHOEFER

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000216

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990209

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI