Global Patent Index - EP 0906394 B1

EP 0906394 B1 2003-06-11 - IMPROVED DETERGENT AND TABLEWARE CLEANER

Title (en)

IMPROVED DETERGENT AND TABLEWARE CLEANER

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE WASCHMITTEL UND GESCHIRREINIGER

Title (fr)

DETERGENT ET PRODUIT A VAISSELLE AMELIORES

Publication

EP 0906394 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914304 A

Priority

  • DE 19611989 A
  • EP 9701511 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735949A1] A mixture containing (a) 0.1 to 99 wt.% of at least one polycarboxylate with at least 3 carboxyl groups, (b) 0.1 to 99 wt.% of at least one amine with a pKs of over 9, and (c) 0.1 to 99 wt.% of at least one acid selected from among mineral and organic acids with one or two carboxyl groups and 10 C atoms at the most, provided that the mixture contains less than 24 wt.% triphosphates, is used in detergent or dishwashing formulations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 1/83; C11D 3/00; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/10; C11D 3/30; C11D 3/36; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 1/40 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 7/08 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/40 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 7/08 (2013.01); C11D 7/3209 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735949 A1 19971002; AU 2160097 A 19971017; BR 9701467 A 19980825; BR 9701467 B1 20090113; BR 9708274 A 19990803; EP 0906394 A1 19990407; EP 0906394 B1 20030611; ES 2201281 T3 20040316; JP 2000510506 A 20000815; JP 4240535 B2 20090318; US 6172028 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140325

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710275

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710275

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050326

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201281 T3

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710275 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010718

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981026

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB