Global Patent Index - EP 0906460 A4

EP 0906460 A4 2000-01-19 - YARNS OF COVERED HIGH MODULUS MATERIAL AND FABRICS FORMED THEREFROM

Title (en)

YARNS OF COVERED HIGH MODULUS MATERIAL AND FABRICS FORMED THEREFROM

Title (de)

FÄDEN, DIE MIT MATERIAL MIT HOHEM E-MODUL ÜBERZOGEN SIND UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTES GEWEBE

Title (fr)

FILS DE MATERIAU A HAUT MODULE RECOUVERT ET TISSUS AINSI FABRIQUES

Publication

EP 0906460 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97943351 A

Priority

  • US 9716505 W
  • US 71048896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812371A1] The present invention is directed towards yarns of covered high modulus filament materials and fabrics which are formed therefrom. The present invention is intended to provide a composite filamentary material which exhibits the advantages of high modulus materials while providing a means for compensating the diminished properties exhibited by such fibers in the direction normal to molecular chain orientation. The composite filament structure of the present invention is a high modulus filament material covered with bicomponent filaments. The composite filament structure has a first interior layer of high modulus filament material and a second exterior layer of bicomponent fibers, the second exterior layer of bicomponent fibers being covered around the first interior layer of high modulus material along its entire length. The entire surface area of the high modulus material should be covered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/18 (2006.01); D02G 3/04 (2006.01); D02G 3/32 (2006.01); D02G 3/36 (2006.01); D02G 3/44 (2006.01); D03D 15/08 (2006.01); D04B 21/18 (2006.01); D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/10 (2006.01); D21F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0027 (2013.01); D02G 3/36 (2013.01); D02G 3/447 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812371 A1 19980326; AT 286997 T 20050115; AU 4484297 A 19980414; AU 716177 B2 20000217; BR 9706771 A 19990824; CA 2237964 A1 19980326; CA 2237964 C 20011204; CN 1096510 C 20021218; CN 1207144 A 19990203; DE 69732234 D1 20050217; DE 69732234 T2 20050623; EP 0906460 A1 19990407; EP 0906460 A4 20000119; EP 0906460 B1 20050112; ES 2231892 T3 20050516; JP 2000501796 A 20000215; JP 3477210 B2 20031210; MX 9803908 A 19980930; NZ 330367 A 19990830

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120913

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120912

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120912

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69732234

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 286997 T

- Effective date: 20120912

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120912

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120913

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110819

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100912

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100912

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231892 T3

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69732234 P 20050217

2005-02-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FABRICS FORMED FROM YARNS OF COVERED HIGH MODULUS MATERIAL

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1999-12-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

1999-09-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

1999-06-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990323;LT PAYMENT 19990323;LV PAYMENT 19990323;RO PAYMENT 19990323;SI PAYMENT 19990323

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980518

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE