Global patent index - EP 0906479 B1

EP 0906479 B1 2000-05-03 - INJECTION HOSE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING IT

Title (en)

INJECTION HOSE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING IT

Title (de)

INJEKTIONSSCHLAUCH UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

FLEXIBLE D'INJECTION ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0906479 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929249 A

Priority

  • DE 19625209 A
  • EP 9703261 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625209A1] The invention concerns an injection hose intended for sealing expansion joints in concrete structures. The hose is in the form a continuous hollow extrusion (12), made of elastic, flexible material, with a continuous longitudinal bore (10) and at least one longitudinal groove (16). The groove (16) is connected to the bore (10) by means of apertures (22) in the wall of the extrusion and is fitted with a sealing strip (24), made of compressible, elastic material, which extends over the apertures (22). Production of the hose is made particularly simple and inexpensive by virtue of the fact that the width of the groove openings (26) is less than the diameter of the sealing strip (24) and that the means for holding the sealing strip (24) in place are formed by making undercuts in the sides (30) of the groove (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/682 (2006.01); E04B 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6816 (2013.01); E04B 2001/6818 (2013.01); Y10S 277/906 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1386 (2013.01); Y10T 428/139 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1393 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625209 A1 19980102; AT 192523 T 20000515; AU 3342497 A 19980114; AU 712472 B2 19991111; EP 0906479 A1 19990407; EP 0906479 B1 20000503; ES 2146473 T3 20000801; JP 2000512699 A 20000926; JP 3181061 B2 20010703; US 6268031 B1 20010731; WO 9749876 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140622

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140621

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140621

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140621

2015-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 192523

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140621

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIKA SCHWEIZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-09-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-07-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146473

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701591

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192523

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIKA AG, VORM. KASPAR WINKLER & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990625

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981113

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI