Global Patent Index - EP 0906510 B1

EP 0906510 B1 2002-12-18 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR AN IGNITION STAGE, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE IGNITION CIRCUIT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR AN IGNITION STAGE, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE IGNITION CIRCUIT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG EINER ZÜNDENDSTUFE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE ZÜNDSCHALTUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

SCHEMA POUR UN ETAGE D'ALLUMAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR LE CIRCUIT D'ALLUMAGE D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0906510 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97930320 A

Priority

  • DE 9701211 W
  • DE 19624530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19624530A1] A circuit arrangement for an ignition stage, in particular for the ignition circuit of a motor vehicle, has a multiple Darlington transistor (Darlington) which drives a primary winding of an ignition coil, and a driving circuit for the Darlington. An npn-Darlington (T5) is provided whose collector is connected to the positive pole (14) of a voltage source and whose emitter is connected to a first connection of the primary winding (16) of the ignition coil (18), whereas the second connection of the primary winding (16) is earthed. The Darlington (T5) is driven by means of a decoupling stage which decouples the driving circuit from a negative blocking voltage applied to the Darlington base when the Darlington (T5) is switched off.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/055; F02P 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/04 (2006.01); F02P 3/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/0442 (2013.01); F02P 3/0552 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19624530 A1 19980102; BR 9709813 A 19990810; EP 0906510 A1 19990407; EP 0906510 B1 20021218; JP 2000512357 A 20000919; US 6167876 B1 20010102; WO 9748904 A1 19971224

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050616

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709017 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709017 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001205

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990120

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT