Global Patent Index - EP 0906556 B1

EP 0906556 B1 2000-09-06 - NON-LETHAL PROJECTILE

Title (en)

NON-LETHAL PROJECTILE

Title (de)

NICHTLETALES GESCHOSS

Title (fr)

PROJECTILE NON LETAL

Publication

EP 0906556 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97930562 A

Priority

  • FR 9701109 W
  • FR 9607780 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749969A1] The invention discloses a non-lethal projectile. This projectile (1) comprises a longitudinal body (5) with an internal longitudinal striking pin (55) capable of piercing a container (47) of fluid under pressure in a controlled manner in particular by the impact of the projectile (1) on a target. The striking pin (55) comprises an internal passage (59) opening outwards of the body (5) by means of canals (60) provided in a rigid wall (35) integral with the body (5) such that the outlet for the fluid under pressure remains clear even if the impact causes a deformation of the container (47). The fluid contained in the container (47) can thus be released and spread over the target even in such case.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9749969 A1 19971231; AU 3447197 A 19980114; CA 2259452 A1 19971231; CA 2259452 C 20041019; DE 69703042 D1 20001012; DE 69703042 T2 20010719; EP 0906556 A1 19990407; EP 0906556 B1 20000906; ES 2150265 T3 20001116; FR 2750206 A1 19971226; FR 2750206 B1 19980911; US 6209461 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040621

2005-06-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040620

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. ETIENNE *LACROIX - TOUS ARTIFICES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-06-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040620

2003-07-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030709

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150265 T3

2000-10-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CON LOR S.R.L.

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703042 20001012

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990819

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990111

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI