Global Patent Index - EP 0906613 B1

EP 0906613 B1 2002-09-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL BY "FORWARD" AND "BACKWARD" LPC ANALYSIS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL BY "FORWARD" AND "BACKWARD" LPC ANALYSIS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG EINES AUDIOSIGNALS MITTELS "VORWÄRTS"- UND "RÜCKWÄRTS"-LPC-ANALYSE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIOFREQUENCE PAR ANALYSE LPC "AVANT" ET "ARRIERE"

Publication

EP 0906613 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98920601 A

Priority

  • FR 9800723 W
  • FR 9704684 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762464A1] The invention concerns a method and a device for coding an audio signal by "forward" and "backward" LPC analysis, the coding being produced by "forward" LPC filtering for non-stationary zones and on a synthetic signal based on "backward" LPC filtering for stationary zones. For each current LPC block (Bn) (10), the degree of stationarity of the digital audio signal is determined (11), and a "forward" or "backward" LPC analysis selection value is established (12) based on a decision function, according to the stationarity parameter. A "forward" or "backward" LPC analysis criterion is applied (13) to the analysis selection value to produce the audio signal coding before proceeding to the next LPC block. The invention is applicable to mobile radiotelephony, to the production, memorisation of audio recordings, to the transmission by satellite and wideband telephony.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01); H04B 14/04 (2006.01); G10L 19/06 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01); G10L 19/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762464 A1 19981023; FR 2762464 B1 19990625; AU 729584 B2 20010208; AU 7340498 A 19981111; BR 9804852 A 19990824; BR 9804852 B1 20110419; CA 2258695 A1 19981022; CA 2258695 C 20030211; CN 1122256 C 20030924; CN 1229501 A 19990922; DE 69807806 D1 20021017; DE 69807806 T2 20030807; EP 0906613 A1 19990407; EP 0906613 B1 20020911; ES 2183358 T3 20030316; HK 1020101 A1 20040528; JP 2000512777 A 20000926; JP 3564144 B2 20040908; US 6327562 B1 20011204; WO 9847134 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180408

2018-05-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180408

2018-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-04-11 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180408

2018-04-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69807806

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183358 T3

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807806 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 19/14 A

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 19/14 A

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981228

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI NL